House | 05/15/2023 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 26, nays 75. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/2023. | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported favorably (9-5). | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Prefiled. |