Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported with amendments (9-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported favorably (13-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|