Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Veto message read, roll called on final consideration. 66 yeas, 29 nays. Not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the veto was not overridden.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2023
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2023
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|