LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB31
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB31
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2023 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB31
Action History
House
05/18/2023
Becomes HB 659.
House
05/17/2023
Reported by substitute (9-0-1).
House
04/10/2023
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
House
02/17/2023
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/17/2023.
House
02/16/2023
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
House
02/16/2023
Prefiled.