LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB312
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB312
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2023 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB312
Action History
House
05/11/2023
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
House
05/10/2023
Reported with amendments (13-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
House
04/10/2023
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
House
04/03/2023
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
House
03/29/2023
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
House
03/29/2023
Prefiled.