House
|
06/14/2023
|
Effective date: 08/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 368.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/08/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Gregory Miller, Mike Johnson, and Brown.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Peacock, Luneau, and Robert Mills.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2023
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2023
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|