House | 05/24/2023 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2023. | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Reported with amendments (6-5). | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Prefiled. |