Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 32. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|