Senate | 05/23/2023 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 34. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2023. | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported with amendments (10-0-1). | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | hb472 | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Prefiled. |