Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Reported with amendments (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Reported with amendments (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|