Senate | 05/23/2023 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 5. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2023. | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Prefiled. |