Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Fontenot, Marino, and Villio.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Foil, Smith, and Abraham.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 10 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably (10-3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|