House
|
06/08/2023
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Becomes Act No. 107.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 28. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 30. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported without amendments (9-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported favorably (17-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/3/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|