House | 05/23/2023 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 27, nays 67. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2023. | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Reported with amendments (9-0-1). | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported with amendments (6-5). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Prefiled. |