House
|
06/28/2023
|
Effective date: 08/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 443.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Huval, Illg, and Firment.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Talbot, Robert Mills, and Bouie.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 56, nays 23. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|