House
|
06/14/2023
|
Effective date: 08/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 372.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 2 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 61, nays 37. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/08/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Mike Johnson, Wright, and Larvadain.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice of change of Senate conferees.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee membership changed: Bernard vice McMath.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: McMath, Luneau, and Cloud.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|