Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 35. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 46, nays 46. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported with amendments (7-5-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|