House | 06/04/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2023. | ||
House | 06/04/2023 | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Reported with amendments (18-0). | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Reported favorably (7-2). | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Prefiled. |