House
|
06/15/2023
|
Effective date: 08/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 411.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 73, nays 21, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 23. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|