House | 05/11/2023 | Becomes HB 655. | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported by substitute (12-4). | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Discharged from the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Prefiled. |