House | 05/17/2023 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported without action, (14-0-1) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Prefiled. |