House
|
05/18/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|