Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Read by title. The Senate failed to approve consideration after the 57th calendar day by a vote of 13 yeas and 24 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported favorably (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|