House
|
06/15/2023
|
Effective date: 06/15/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 413.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 104, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported with amendments (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|