Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 25. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2023. | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Reported favorably (9-4). | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/10/2023. | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Prefiled. |