Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2023. | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported with amendments (13-0). | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |