House
|
06/14/2023
|
Effective date: 07/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 382.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|