House | 05/23/2023 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2023. | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2023. | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Reported favorably (15-0). | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |