House
|
06/08/2023
|
Effective date: 08/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 183.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2023
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 106 reported by the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice (10-0).
|
|
|