House
|
07/18/2023
|
Veto message read, roll called on final consideration. 69 yeas, 30 nays. Not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the veto was not overridden.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 75, nays 15, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
By a vote of 77 yeas, 17 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 33. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 159 reported by the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs (10-0-1).
|
|
|