House
|
07/19/2023
|
Effective date: 01/01/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2023
|
Becomes Act No. 466.
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2023
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Notice Senate voted to override the Governor's veto
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
By a vote of 28 yeas and 11 nays, the Senate voted to override the Governor's veto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
By a vote of 27 yeas and 7 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Notice House voted to override the Governor's veto.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Veto message read, roll called on final consideration, 76 yeas, 23 nays. Veto overridden by two-thirds vote of the elected members.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 75, nays 25, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 10 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
By a vote of 26 yeas and 12 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 24. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 463 reported by the Committee on Health and Welfare (14-3).
|
|
|