House
|
06/14/2023
|
Effective date: 08/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 383.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
By a vote of 98 yeas, 1 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported with amendments (9-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 603 reported by the Committee on Commerce (11-0).
|
|
|