Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 572 reported by the Committee on Health and Welfare (12-4).
|
|
|