Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read.
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 73, nays 19, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 58, nays 36. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 31 reported by the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice (9-0-1).
|
|
|