Senate | 05/25/2023 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2023. | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Reported favorably (13-0). | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/10/2023. | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Prefiled. |