House
|
06/06/2023
|
Effective date: 08/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 56.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported favorably (11-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/17/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|