House | 05/11/2023 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 34, nays 54. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2023. | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported with amendments (8-0-1). | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/17/2023. | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Prefiled. |