House | 06/04/2023 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2023 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 92, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2023. | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |