House
|
06/12/2023
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 1. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Reported favorably (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|