House | 06/07/2023 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2023. | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/05/2023 | Reported with amendments (10-0-1). | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Reported favorably (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |