House
|
06/08/2023
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Read by title. Rules suspended. Concurred by vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 104, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 7 for 05/04/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported favorably (17-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|