House | 04/25/2023 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |