House | 05/24/2023 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2023. | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Reported favorably (10-0-1). | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported with amendments (15-0). | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |