House | 05/11/2023 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/4/2023. | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |