Senate | 05/26/2023 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 102, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023. | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Reported favorably (13-0). | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |