House | 05/09/2023 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 50, nays 51. The resolution was rejected. | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2023. | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2023. | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Reported favorably (6-5-1). | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |