House | 05/30/2023 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 86, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2023. | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |