House | 06/09/2023 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 81, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/08/2023. | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Notice given. | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2023. | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Reported with amendments (7-0). | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |