House | 06/05/2023 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2023. | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | Reported favorably (15-0). | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |