LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HR180
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HR180
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2023 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR180
Action History
House
06/07/2023
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
House
06/06/2023
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2023.
House
06/06/2023
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
06/05/2023
Reported with amendments (11-0-1).
House
05/23/2023
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
House
05/22/2023
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.